WARK RECREATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide sporting and recreational facilities to the village and parish of Wark, Northumberland. This includes cricket and football pitches for rent, a children's playground, a 5-a-side pitch, floodlit training areas and a large pavilion that can be used for parties, weddings, receptions et al.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 06 December 2019: CIO registration
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 522156 WARK RECREATIONAL CHARITY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAPHNE DICKESON | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Desmond Napier | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Nigel Wright | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Spencer Gilroy | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Will David Forsyth | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Ellison | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Glendinning | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.55k | £8.86k | £3.44k | £31.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.20k | £5.07k | £3.70k | £41.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 25 October 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 25 October 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 13 February 2023 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 13 February 2023 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 13 February 2023 | 501 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 13 February 2023 | 501 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WARK IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Warkshaugh
Wark
HEXHAM
Northumberland
NE48 3NP
- Phone:
- 01434230629
- Email:
- m_stoksted@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window