ROTARY CLUB OF BRADFORD BRONTE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This is our Charity Account which runs alongside our normal Rotary activities. It used to enable us to raise funds to help the various local charities and people in the Bradford District. We are happy to help all activities that are considered a worthy cause and benefits people locally and nationally. Funds are raised through sponsored walks, charitable events and bucket collections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 December 2019: Standard registration
- THE ROTARY CLUB OF BRADFORD BRONTE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saleem Kader | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WHALLEY | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elisabeth Griffin | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.82k | £5.82k | £3.30k | £6.69k | £19.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.64k | £6.66k | £9.19k | £2.59k | £20.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 June 2023 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 January 2023 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 January 2023 | 636 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 DEC 2009
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES HEREBY DECLARE THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD AND APPLY THE TRUST FUND AND ALL OTHER MONIES WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE RECEIVED BY THE TRUSTEES (WHETHER SUCH MONIES SHALL ARISE FROM DONATIONS BEQUESTS DEEDS OF COVENANT OR FROM ANY OTHER SOURCE) AND ALSO THE INVESTMENTS FOR THE TIME BEING REPRESENTING THE SAME ( ALL OF WHICH ARE HEREINAFTER INCLUDED IN THE EXPRESSION "THE TRUST FUND") UPON TRUST TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Great Victoria Hotel
Bridge Street
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD1 1JX
- Phone:
- 07816885759
- Email:
- anigriffin@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window