CHERISH DEMENTIA HOLIDAYS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide holidays and day trips and other activities for people with Dementia and their Carers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 25 November 2019: CIO registration
- 07 September 2022: Funds received from 1145734 CHERISH DEMENTIA HOLIDAY TRUST
- CHERISH DEMENTIA HOLIDAYS CIO (Working name)
- CHERISH DEMENTIA HOLIDAY CIO (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keiran Lee | Chair | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARY WRIGHT | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pat Shilton | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Bishop | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Blanche McCartney | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.71k | £7.19k | £6.99k | £21.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.63k | £4.99k | £6.96k | £25.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 05 October 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Nov 2019 as amended on 27 Jan 2020 as amended on 27 Jan 2020 as amended on 27 Jan 2020 as amended on 27 Jan 2020 as amended on 28 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PERSONS WHO ARE CURRENTLY OR WERE FORMERLY CARING FOR PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA IN COVENTRY, SOLIHULL AND WARWICKSHIRE, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING SHORT BREAK HOLIDAYS, ACTIVITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR SOCIAL INTERACTION. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS THE CHARITY WILL: - ORGANISE AND PROVIDE SHORT HOLIDAYS FOR THOSE WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS; - ENCOURAGE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY BRINGING PEOPLE WITH CARE RESPONSIBILITIES FROM ALL SECTIONS OF THE COMMUNITY TOGETHER FOR MUTUAL SUPPORT AND SHARED LEARNING; - PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR CARERS AND THOSE PEOPLE BEING CARED FOR TO EXPERIENCE A DIFFERENT ENVIRONMENT GIVING THEM A BREAK FROM THEIR DAY TO DAY ROUTINE; - RAISE AWARENESS OF THE ACTIVITIES OF THE ORGANISATION AND THE POSITIVE BENEFITS FOR CARERS AND THOSE CARED FOR.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Keresley Road
COVENTRY
CV6 2JD
- Phone:
- 07718235720
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window