KIDSCAPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to provide practical support, training, and advice to challenge bullying and protect young lives. We reduce the impact of bullying and harm through programmes and services that: Build communities of support Reduce isolation and loneliness Promote positive relationships Support resilience and wellbeing Help children recognise and respond to bullying behaviour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 April 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Gray | Chair | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Jason Tait | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Salvatore Petrone | Trustee | 21 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Kitty Poole | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard Charles H Bowyer | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Constantine Hadjipateras | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
2. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 2.1. TO PROTECT CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM BULLYING AND OTHER FORMS OF HARM, AND TO PROMOTE THE WELLBEING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY: 2.1.1. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN RELATION TO BULLYING AND OTHER FORMS OF HARM, BY MEANS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO COMMUNITY AND SCHOOL-BASED WORKSHOPS; 2.1.2 PROMOTING THE BUILDING OF COMMUNITIES OF SUPPORT TO KEEP CHILDREN SAFE FROM BULLYING AND OTHER FORMS OF HARM, BY MEANS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROVIDING TRAINING, RESOURCES, PEER MENTORING AND OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT, IN EACH CASE PARENTS, CARERS, SCHOOLS, SPORTS CLUBS AND ORGANISATIONS THAT HAVE CONTACT WITH CHILDREN AND FAMILIES; AND 2.2 TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES COMPLEMENTARY TO THE FOREGOING OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8-10 South Street
Epsom
Surrey
KT18 7PF
- Phone:
- 02077303300
- Email:
- info@kidscape.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window