AYLESTONE PARK BOYS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Recreational Facilities for Young People
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 03 May 1984: Standard registration
- AYLESTONE PARK YOUTH CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Cramp | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Greaves | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dave Greaves | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luke St Clair | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.88k | £113.02k | £54.04k | £5.23k | £68.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.09k | £62.86k | £94.45k | £34.65k | £1.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 10 December 2024 | 285 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 June 2023 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 June 2023 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JUNE 1982 AS AMENDED 2 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE CLUB ARE TO OFFER ALL BOYS AND GIRLS, IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR ORIGINS, BELIEFS AND SOCIAL BACKGROUND, THE KNOWLEDGE, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT THEY REQUIRE WHICH WILL UTILISE TO THE FULL, THEIR POTENTIAL AS THEY PREPARE FOR LIFE IN SOCIETY AND THEIR RESPONSIBILITIES AS ADULTS. TO ENCOURAGE THESE YOUNG PEOPLE TO MEET, WORK AND MIX TOGETHER THROUGH MIXED AND SINGLE SEX SPORTING AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE CLUB AND TOGETHER WITH MEMBERS OF OTHER CLUBS. TO HELP THEM TO DEVELOP AND ENJOY THEIR INDIVIDUAL AND TEAM SKILLS IN FAIR AND HONEST COMPETITION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aylestone Park Football Club
Saffron Lane
LEICESTER
LE2 6TG
- Phone:
- 07917899459
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
aylestoneparkfc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window