CYLCH MEITHRIN BRO TEIFI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Cylch Meithrin situated in a small village offering childcare services for parents and carers for their 2-4 year old children. We also provide provision for flying start
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £87,649 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 17 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carys Naomi Davies-James | Chair | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sian Elena Evans | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carys Llywelyn | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Jones | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heledd Llyr Thomas | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.89k | £131.33k | £149.24k | £158.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.56k | £130.20k | £119.09k | £149.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £36.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.86k | N/A | £71.12k | £87.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH LANGUAGE WITHIN THE AREA OF LLANDYSUL
Contact information
- Address:
-
YSGOL BRO TEIFI
HOREB
LLANDYSUL
SA44 4JL
- Phone:
- 01559363945
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window