LEADERS 4 CHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Homeless services advice, advocacy and housing solutions for vulnerable and at risk individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Atkins | Chair | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew le Marinel | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Martin Lonsdale | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £19.93k | £3.61k | £525 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £90 | £87 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 25 September 2024 | 392 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | 25 September 2024 | 392 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 13 January 2022 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | 13 January 2022 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF HOMELESS PEOPLE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS, FOOD, TEMPORARY SHELTER, AND SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/- Double Decker Buses
Yard 2A Canal Way
London
W10 5AZ
- Phone:
- 02070609410
- Email:
- hello@leaders4change.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window