FACOBLY DIASPORA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Advice information and referrals - Befriending activities - Health promotion - Recreational activities - Employment support services -Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 May 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miriam Marku | Chair | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARIE - MADELEINE ACQUAH | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Theo Flavien Oue | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.70k | £15.70k | £11.20k | £8.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.70k | £13.60k | £9.10k | £7.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 May 2025 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 August 2022 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BASIC ENGLISH SKILLS, LITERACY, MATHS AND SCIENCE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THOSE WHERE ENGLISH IS A SECOND LANGUAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Rochdale Way
LONDON
SE8 4LY
- Phone:
- 07854212079
- Email:
- diasporafacobly@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window