COTTONTAILS PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1186329
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of early years education and childcare

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 May 2020

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 2019: CIO registration
  • 18 September 2020: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 18 September 2020: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/05/2020
Total gross income £0
Total expenditure £0
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 May 2020 06 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 May 2020 06 June 2020 On Time