British Association of Clinicians in ME/CFS (BACME)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association champions clinically effective practice in treating ME/CFS and other primary fatigue conditions by supporting UK clinical professionals working in the field. It achieves this through the delivery of education and training, provision of information on clinically effective treatments and recent research, and networking opportunities. Activitities can be accessed on line -BACME.info
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 January 2021: CIO registration
- British Association of Clinicians in ME/CFS (BACME) (Working name)
- BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR CFS/ME (BACME) (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Gregorowski | Chair | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
FIONA MCKECHNIE | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David William Vickers | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARINA CLAIRE TOWNEND | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marta Prytys | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Street | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ceridwen Rutter | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Joanna Adler | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gladwell | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Les Parry | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Oliver | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rhonda Valerie Knight | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Karen Roberts | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.14k | £42.75k | £5.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.61k | £16.43k | £8.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Jan 2021 as amended on 19 Apr 2022 as amended on 23 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY 3.1 CHAMPIONING CLINICALLY EFFECTIVE PRACTICE IN TREATING CFS/ME AND OTHER PRIMARY FATIGUE CONDITIONS 3.2 DISSEMINATING OF RECENT EVIDENCE AND PRACTICE TO CLINICAL PRACTITIONERS 3.3 PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR MEMBERS RESPECTING UP-TO-DATE EVIDENCE AND BEST SHARED PRACTICE 3.4 ADVOCATING FOR EQUITY OF ACCESS AND EXCELLENCE IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES 3.5 FACILITATING NETWORKING AMONGST CLINICIANS, RESEARCHERS AND PATIENTS 3.6 ADVOCATING FOR AND PROMOTING RELEVANT RESEARCH AND TO PUBLISH ALL USEFUL RESULTS ARISING FROM ANY RESEARCH SUPPORTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Paediatric and Adolescent Division
University College Hospital London
6th floor central
250 Euston Road
London
NW1 2PG
- Phone:
- 02034475240
- Email:
- a.gregorowski@nhs.net
- Website:
-
BACME.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window