Trustees PARENTS AND CARERS IN PERFORMING ARTS (PIPA)

Charity number: 1190045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shazia Tasneem Mustafa Chair 05 July 2021
None on record
Constance Oak Trustee 07 February 2025
None on record
Laura Friedner Trustee 19 July 2024
None on record
Mx Loose Baker Trustee 03 May 2024
None on record
Katie Kerry Trustee 03 May 2024
None on record
Julia Ossenbruegge Trustee 03 May 2024
None on record
Taio Renee-Lawson Trustee 03 May 2024
None on record
Gemma Jeynes Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Laura Harvey Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record