CHASING RAINBOWS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chasing rainbows provide a vital service within the local community of Hull & The East Riding of Yorkshire supporting women and partners going through baby loss, infertility and miscarriage. We offer an environment to talk about loss and to support you. We also have focussed support for women going through recurrent miscarriage and infertility and campaign for better compassionate bereavement care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Virginia Kocik | Chair | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma MacRae | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ainsley Belton | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Joy Donnelly | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Lake | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Dobson | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.02k | £7.24k | £25.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.33k | £19.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO RAISE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING IN THE SUBJECT OF FERTILITY, PREGNANCY LOSS AND RECURRENT MISCARRIAGE AND INTO ITS EFFECTS ON WOMEN, WHETHER PHYSICAL, MEDICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL OR SOCIAL. THE RELIEF OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF RECURRENT MISCARRIAGES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT GROUPS, TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE FOR WOMEN WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF MISCARRIAGE OR INFERTILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Arkwright Park
Kirkella
HU10 7JZ
- Phone:
- 07956174284
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window