THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WESTCLIFF ST PETER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the mission of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 05 December 2019: Standard registration
- ST PETER 'S WESTCLIFF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Colin Steven Baldwin | Chair | 24 March 2019 |
|
|||||
John Alexander Dunlop | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Moira Palmer | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Obioma Ude Ighodalo-Eromosele | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Margaret Strudwick | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Amana Rapp | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Chukwudum Aguocha | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.60k | £109.62k | £142.04k | £182.88k | £128.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.09k | £93.90k | £136.84k | £194.68k | £136.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PETERS CHURCH
EASTBOURNE GROVE
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
SS0 0QF
- Phone:
- 01702300402
- Email:
- office@lifestreams.org.uk
- Website:
-
LifeStreams.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window