GREAT AYCLIFFE CANCER SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Give assistance to members of the public who are suffering from or who have suffered from cancer. The assistance is extended to their families and carers. The assistance can take the form of financial support, advice, companionship, transport to hospital and other medical appointments or short holidays in the charity's caravan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 10 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allison White | Chair | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Whittington | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Goff | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Flynn | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Coopey | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER FALCONER | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Moody | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.97k | £66.76k | £56.51k | £108.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.63k | £41.53k | £56.85k | £90.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 July 2024 | 259 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 July 2024 | 259 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2023 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2023 | 303 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 November 2022 | 390 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
25 November 2022 | 390 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF, AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING AMONGST, PEOPLE DIAGNOSED WITH AND RECOVERING FROM TREATMENT FOR CANCER (INCLUDING THEIR FAMILY AND CARERS WHO HAVE BEEN AFFECTED BY SUCH CANCER) IN NEWTON AYCLIFFE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION AND A SIGNPOSTING SERVICE DESIGNED TO BETTER INFORM PEOPLE IN NEED OF SUPPORT; B) PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES INCLUDING CHEMOTHERAPY GOODIE BAGS, DAY TRIPS, SHORT BREAKS, RESPITE BREAKS AND VOLUNTEER TRANSPORT TO AND FROM MEDICAL APPOINTMENTS; C) WORKING WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS AND ALL OTHER QUALIFIED AND APPROPRIATE ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS IN ORDER TO CREATE VALUABLE LINKS AND BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF CANCER SUFFERERS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 GREATHEAD CRESCENT
NEWTON AYCLIFFE
DL5 5DP
- Phone:
- 07762258696
- Email:
- allisonwhite75@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window