CHURCH OF GOD IN ROMFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gospel/ evangelical witness to all ages via Church services, youth and other clubs, social events, camps, literature and multi-media methods. Coffee mornings in support of other Charities. Teenage Saturday Club activities and Young Christians groups with South East Churches. Local events all at New Manor Hall, in homes of church members with house groups. OHP lunches and craft nights for charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Jarvis | Chair | 10 May 1974 |
|
|
||||
John Kernaghan | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Merchant | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PARKER | Trustee | 03 December 2006 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.08k | £21.89k | £21.08k | £6.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.53k | £21.53k | £22.07k | £5.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO ("THE OBJECTS")IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP;
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW MANOR HALL
1B MANOR ROAD
ROMFORD
RM1 2RA
- Phone:
- 07775558820
- Email:
- alexjarvis10@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
churchesofgod.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window