CALVARY CHAPEL BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian church operating in Bristol, UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 19 December 2019: CIO registration
- 11 September 2023: Funds received from 1117165 CALVARY CHAPEL DOCKLANDS
- CALVARY BRISTOL (Working name)
- CC BRISTOL (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Arnold | Chair | 24 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Martin Tatton | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Vickery | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.47k | £23.26k | £28.97k | £32.42k | £27.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.76k | £17.09k | £29.66k | £32.53k | £27.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING: A. TO WORSHIP THE TRIUNE GOD (FATHER, SON AND HOLY SPIRIT); B. TO SHOW THE LOVE OF JESUS CHRIST WITH ALL WHOM WE ENCOUNTER; C. TO PROMOTE PEACE WITH GOD, OTHERS, AND IN ONESELF THROUGH THE KNOWLEDGE OF GOD AND THE FORGIVENESS OF SINS; D. TO INSTRUCT PEOPLE IN CHRISTIAN LIVING, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE TEACHING AND PREACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD (THE BIBLE); E. TO PROCLAIM THAT MEN AND WOMEN SHOULD REPENT AND BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST AS SAVIOUR AND LORD; AND F. AS WE HAVE OPPORTUNITY, TO DO GOOD TO ALL, ESPECIALLY TO THOSE WHO ARE OF THE HOUSEHOLD OF FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Atkins Close
BRISTOL
BS14 8JS
- Phone:
- 07951882763
- Website:
-
calvarychapelbristol.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window