MIDLANDS PARKS FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Midlands Parks Forum operates as an umbrella organisation in the East and West Midlands, to help improve green spaces. We help to raise standards and share good practice through conferences, workshops and educational forums, to share and learn with green space practitioners from local authorities; agencies such as Natural England and LANTRA; charities, and corporate partners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liz Stuffins MSc CMLI | Chair | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Claire Hogg BSc | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Cairncross | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hunt | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ishrat Karimi Fini M.A. | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Rae Village BA Msc | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Lewis | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DYMOND | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.53k | £66.57k | £34.39k | £64.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.85k | £43.25k | £36.10k | £34.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE AND ENHANCE, AND / OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION AND ENHANCEMENT OF, THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE USE AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT, AND THE PROMOTION OF BIODIVERSITY) AND SHALL INCLUDE BUT IS NOT LIMITED TO PUBLIC PARKS, GARDENS, LANDSCAPED AREAS, WOODLAND, PLAYING FIELDS, PLAYGROUNDS, NATURE RESERVES AND RECREATIONAL SPACES; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) WITH REGARDS TO THE HORTICULTURE, ARBORICULTURE, ECOLOGY, GEOLOGY, ARCHAEOLOGY, SUSTAINABILITY, HERITAGE AND LOCAL HISTORY; AND 3. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC BY THE IMPROVEMENT OF PARKS AND GREEN OPEN SPACES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE, THE CHARITY WILL PROVIDE AN UMBRELLA GROUP FOR OTHER INTERESTED ORGANISATIONS. IN THESE OBJECTS, THE AREA OF BENEFIT MEANS, THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS WITHIN THE EAST AND WEST MIDLANDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
186 ALCESTER ROAD SOUTH
BIRMINGHAM
B14 6DE
- Phone:
- 07384 312840
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window