Accounts and annual returns TOWN HALL CHARITY

Charity Number: 515103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 11 October 2024 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required