THE TREETOP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The treetop foundation provides teaching resources, food and supplies internationally to areas in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 06 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Claire Smithers | Chair | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Evie Freya Roberta Pearce | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £32.76k | £43.36k | £18.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £474 | £31.27k | £44.85k | £18.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 November 2022 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 November 2022 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SCHOOL AGED CHILDREN IN TOMBODU, KONO DISTRICT SIERRA LEONE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY A SCHOOLS FEEDING PROGRAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33A NEWTON WAY
WOOLSTHORPE BY COLSTERWORTH
GRANTHAM
NG33 5NR
- Phone:
- 07455132259
- Email:
- jo.smithers@aol.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window