EAST END WOMEN'S MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A public history project to record share and celebrate women's stories from East London's history
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 2020: CIO registration
- EEWM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Owen | Chair | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Freya Barry | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hendy | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cecile Communal | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Scalzo | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Korantema Anyimadu | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.02k | £132.21k | £20.24k | £592 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.18k | £119.74k | £30.74k | £17.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.99k | £108.51k | £9.93k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 224 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT DEDICATED TO RECORDING AND DISPLAYING THE HISTORIES OF WOMEN AND GIRLS FROM LONDON’S EAST END THROUGH A VARIETY OF COLLECTIONS, EXHIBITIONS AND EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
776-778 Barking Road
London
E13 9PJ
- Phone:
- 07724667042
- Website:
-
eastendwomensmuseum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window