HOLY APOSTOLIC CATHOLIC ASSYRIAN CHURCH OF THE EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are, for the public benefit, to advance the Christian faith in the tradition of the Holy Apostolic Catholic Assyrian Church of the East in the United Kingdom, primarily but not exclusively through the provision of a place or places of worship, the administration of the sacraments, rites and ceremonies of the Church according to its usage and forms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ealing
- Austria
- Belgium
- Cyprus
- France
- Greece
- Luxembourg
- Netherlands
- Switzerland
Governance
- 11 November 2019: CIO registration
- HOLY APOLISTIC CATHOLIC ASSYRIAN CHURCH OF THE EAST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bishop Awraham Youkhanis | Chair | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Evan Bahram | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
LO'AY NIMROUD PETROS ODISH | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aoner Yonan | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Younan David Michael | Trustee | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £522.89k | £201.08k | £271.57k | £430.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.86k | £133.46k | £246.43k | £275.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £47.19k | £40.96k | £2.10k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £217.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £305.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £499 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £94.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £61.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Nov 2019 as amended on 18 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE TRADITION OF THE HOLY APOSTOLIC CATHOLIC ASSYRIAN CHURCH OF THE EAST (THE ÔCHURCHÖ) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OR PLACES OF WORSHIP, THE ADMINISTRATION OF THE SACRAMENTS, RITES AND CEREMONIES OF THE CHURCH ACCORDING TO ITS USAGE AND FORMS, THE PROCLAMATION OF THE GOSPEL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHURCH FAITH, AND THE PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION OF LITERATURE RELATING TO THE CHURCH FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Mary's Cathedral
St. James Avenue
LONDON
W13 9DL
- Phone:
- 07836388778
- Email:
- info@acote.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window