FALL INTO PLACE THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The advancement of the art of drama in such ways as the trustees may from time to time decide. 2. To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society through the provision of creative activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £12,383 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VANESSA BROWN | Chair | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Stevens | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aisha Ali | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £282.05k | £113.92k | £83.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.05k | £128.98k | £97.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £114.91k | £41.07k | £12.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 May 2020
Charitable objects
“THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE SEACROFT AREA OF LEEDS: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART OF DRAMA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THOUGH THE PROVISION OF CREATIVE ACTIVITIES. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEARTS AND ENTERPRISE CENTRE
BENNETT ROAD
HEADINGLEY
LEEDS
LF6 3HN
- Phone:
- 07341254967
- Email:
- info@fallintoplace.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window