ELSENHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ELSENHAM WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MEMORIAL HALL FOR THE USE OF ORGANISATIONS, CLUBS AND PRIVATE HIRE. TO HOLD EVENTS THROUGHOUT THE YEAR TO RAISE FUNDS - VILLAGE FETE, CHRISTMAS BAZAAR. TO FACILITATE THE PRODUCTION OF ELSENHAM NEWS(VILLAGE MAGAZINE).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- ECA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Waite Mrs | Chair | 12 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Douglas James Stephenson | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Richardson | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Jolly | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Waite | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robert Watt Jackson | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ricky Lambourne | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY PATRICIA MARY WILCOCK | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Eatson | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter John Johnson | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Petrina Michelle Lees | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Gillian Lesley Hathaway | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Mary Lambert | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Moyra Jean Jackson | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Cheryl Tina Rae | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allan Hathaway | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Shaw | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID VICTOR VERLANDER | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.01k | £33.62k | £28.12k | £34.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.82k | £24.51k | £48.08k | £56.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £2.87k | £2.46k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN ELSENHAM MEMORIAL HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ELSENHAM ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, GENDER REASSIGNMENT, MARRIAGE OR CIVIL PARTNERSHIP, PREGNANCY OR MATERNITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elsenham Memorial Hall
Off Leigh Drive
Elsenham
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
CM22 6BY
- Phone:
- 07050129549
- Email:
- ELSENHAMCA@BTINTERNET.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window