LAMBOR FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support disadvantaged communities primarily in Tanzania but also in the UK. We send donations for food and provisions to families that are living in abject poverty. We sponsor students to enable them to attend school in areas where there is little or no state education. We do not offer individual grants but prefer to work with charitable organisations that have knowledge of the local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
- Tanzania
Governance
- 26 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Lambor | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Lambor | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lambor | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Lambor | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £15.00k | £12.00k | £12.90k | £2.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.21k | £9.59k | £14.32k | £14.99k | £3.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- . 1.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN THE LOCAL REGION OF SOUTH-EAST ENGLAND AND FURTHER AFIELD IN TANZANIA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO HELPING HOMELESS ADULTS IN THE UK TO ENABLE THEM TO MOVE AWAY FROM SUBSTANCE ABUSE, SEEK ACCOMMODATION AND EMPLOYMENT AND REGAIN A SENSE OF WORTH; 2.TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION AND MEDICATION TO FAMILIES IN TANZANIA AFFECTED BY HIV AND AIDS; AND 3.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SPONSORING STUDENTS IN TANZANIA, PROVIDING UNIFORMS AND SUCH ASSISTANCE DEEMED APPROPRIATE TO ENABLE THEM TO COMPLETE THEIR EDUCATION AT HIGH SCHOOL AND UNIVERSITY LEVEL. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greentree Hall
High Street
Balcombe
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH17 6JZ
- Phone:
- 01444811537
- Email:
- slambor@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window