Accounts and annual returns THE CIRCUS PROJECT

Charity number: 1190577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 December 2023 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 December 2023 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window