THE CIRCUS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Circus Project is an aerial circus arts training organisation. We offer weekly classes and workshops to the community of Brighton and Hove and the surrounding areas. Children from 7yrs and adults of all ages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 27 July 2020: CIO registration
- 13 January 2021: Funds received from 1107838 THE CIRCUS PROJECT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER HEDGETHORNE | Chair | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Selene Rull-Usano | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Annie Carroll | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Kenward | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Ward | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.77k | £39.14k | £44.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.87k | £30.17k | £42.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 December 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 December 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BRIGHTON & HOVE, PRIMARILY IN HANGLETON & KNOLL, BOTH BY THE TEACHING OF CIRCUS SKILLS IN A SAFE AND SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENT AND BY THE PROVISION OF ACCESS TO PROFESSIONAL CIRCUS AND THEATRICAL PRODUCTIONS THROUGH PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HANGLETON COMMUNITY CENTRE
HARMSWORTH CRESCENT
HOVE
BN3 8BW
- Phone:
- 07957456961
- Email:
- mail@thecircusproject.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window