GO NORTH DEVON

Charity number: 1191370
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We aim to help those in North Devon and the surrounding area who experience mobility problems due to age or disability, with the provision of equipment, information and support services and to provide transport services for those with special needs, no independent means of travel or for those living in areas where there is no adequate public transport.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 September 2020: CIO registration
  • 26 April 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 26 April 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted