CYLCH MEITHRIN DYFFRYN YR ENFYS (DOLGARROG)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provider of Pre-School Nursery Education through the medium of Welsh in the Ysgol Dyffryn yr Enfys school catchment area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £43,842 from 6 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Conwy
Governance
- 29 November 2019: CIO registration
- 14 April 2021: Funds received from 1082419 CYLCH MEITHRIN DOLGARROG
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Llinos Wyn Griffiths | Chair | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Eleri Roberts | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Williams | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ffion Roberts | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.21k | £33.02k | £41.19k | £52.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.29k | £28.31k | £38.55k | £47.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.49k | £23.33k | £34.29k | £43.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 March 2025 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 March 2025 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 194 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 April 2022 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 April 2022 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
AMCAN[ION] Y SCE YW: HYRWYDDO ADDYSG GYFRWNG CYMRAEG I BLANT OED CYN YSGOL YN ARDALOEDD DOLGARROG, TREFRIW A THALYBONT YN NYFFRYN CONWY. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH LANGUAGE WITHIN THE AREAS OF DOLGARROG, TREFRIW AND TALYBONT IN DYFFYN CONWY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ysgol Dyffryn yr Enfys
Dolgarrog
CONWY
LL32 8QE
- Phone:
- 07706336342
- Email:
- cmdyffrynyrenfys@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window