GROWGREENCARBON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GrowGreenCarbon facilitates projects which build green carbon in the environment. Working with the Environmental Change Institute, Oxford University, the charity will lead the curation of the Oxfordshire Treescape Opportunity Mapping Project, which was initiated by the Oxfordshire Lieutenancy late in 2019, to increase the number of trees, in all their forms, in rural and urban Oxfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £6.99k | £8.40k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.48k | £10.80k | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
I) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY SUPPORTING PROJECTS WHICH ENRICH GREEN CARBON AND ECOSYSTEM SERVICES IN THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND SUPPORT ENHANCED ENVIRONMENTAL RESILIENCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO METHODS OF INCREASING GREEN CARBON AND BIODIVERSITY IN THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window