Accounts and annual returns BETHEL APOSTOLIC CHURCH LOWHILL LIMITED

Charity number: 1192619
Charity reporting is up to date (64 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 September 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 02 September 2024 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 August 2024 428 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 31 August 2024 428 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 September 2023 453 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window