THE COUNTIES HERITAGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHF supports the conservation of arts and heritage and the training of conservation craft skills, all for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 31 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Ransome Wallis FRSA FRBS | Chair | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Brudenell | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Hutton | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Newton FRICS | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Manuela Cridland FCA | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £4.14k | £4.25k | £10.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.36k | £1.42k | £4.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF BUILDINGS, ITEMS AND ARTEFACTS OF HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC SIGNIFICANCE IN THE COUNTIES OF LEICESTERSHIRE, RUTLAND, LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTHAMPTONSHIRE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ASSIST IN THEIR UPKEEP, RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION AND TO SUPPORT EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND EXHIBITIONS IN THE FIELD OF HISTORIC CONSERVATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOME FARM HOUSE
LILFORD
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 5SG
- Phone:
- 01832720510
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window