GECKO ON THE MOVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with local primary school teachers and children aged 5 to7 years old in Tanzania and Nepal. Through inservice, we model and demonstrate good maths teaching methods and strategies to teachers. Our aim is to provide training in the use of manipulatives in maths in order to strengthen teacher knowledge, understanding and teaching of the base ten number system and place value concepts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kenya
- Nepal
- Tanzania
- Zambia
Governance
- 04 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Harper | Chair | 17 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Marandu | Trustee | 31 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Welch | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.08k | £4.73k | £4.55k | £5.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.09k | £3.44k | £6.04k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SCHOOL AGE CHILDREN THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE SUBJECT OF MATHS, BY SUPPORTING TEACHERS AND BY SUPPLYING EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES SUCH AS MATH MANIPULATIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Terrigal
Grove Road
HINDHEAD
Surrey
GU26 6QR
- Phone:
- 07340777967
- Email:
- info@geckoonthemove.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window