Trustees EVERGREENS MINIATURE RAILWAY

Charity number: 1189294
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Palmer Chair 23 April 2022
None on record
Edward Bingham Trustee 16 April 2025
None on record
Nichola Mutti Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Zak Harding Trustee 09 March 2024
None on record
Phil Wiseman Trustee 27 January 2024
None on record
Richard Barnes Trustee 04 November 2023
None on record
Valerie Ledden Trustee 22 April 2023
None on record
Kevin AUGER Trustee 22 April 2023
None on record