DYKE BAPTIST CHAPEL AND SCHOOLROOM CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance of the building known as Dyke Baptist Chapel and Schoolroom Main Road Dyke Bourne Lincolnshire and to further the religious and other charitable work of the congregation of the said chapel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 04 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Edward Benner | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen George Knipe | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Elizabeth Swain | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Cecil Stubbs | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
TERRY BIRKENSHAW | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|||||
ANNA MARY MCIVOR | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joan Christine Woods | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £244 | £14.49k | £14.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £273 | £13.23k | £14.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 13 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 13 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO MAINTAIN THE BUILDINGS KNOWN AS DYKE BAPTIST CHAPEL AND SCHOOL ROOM MAIN ROAD DYKE BOURNE LINCOLNSHIRE AND ITS GROUNDS. 2. TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION MEETING FOR RELIGIOUS WORSHIP AT THE BAPTIST CHAPEL IN DYKE AFORESAID.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43A Main Road
Dyke
BOURNE
Lincolnshire
PE10 0AF
- Phone:
- 01778424633
- Email:
- kateswainy@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window