Trustees THAMES SAILING CLUB
Charity number: 1186490

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Franklyn Laity | Chair | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David-barrington West | Trustee | 04 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Alan Edward Wilson | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
kevin michael pearson | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Eleanor Munday | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Justin John Dunn | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.