Apostolic Mission Mount of Olives Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To worship and serve God and to fulfil the Great Commission of Jesus Christ as set forth in Matthew 28:19-20. To help the most underprivileged, deprived and vulnerable members of the society, providing education whilst promoting the Christian faith. We have continued to consolidate our structures focusing on the development of cultural and religious projects, as well as social cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
- Rochdale
- Angola
- Cape Verde
- Guinea-bissau
Governance
- 17 August 2020: Standard registration
- EUROPEAN FIRE TEMPLE OF THE HOLY SPIRIT CHURCH (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paulo Rolinha | Chair | 21 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maria Tereza De Pina Rolinha | Trustee | 21 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Domingos Nassana | Trustee | 21 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.34k | £8.11k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.86k | £11.09k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 AUG 2016 as amended on 03 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF EUROPEAN FIRE TEMPLE OF THE HOLY SPIRIT ARE: 1. TO WORSHIP AND SERVE GOD AND TO FULFIL THE GREAT COMMISSION OF JESUS CHRIST AS SET FORTH IN MATTHEW 28:19-20. 2. TO MINISTER TO THE NEEDS OF THE MEMBERS AND OTHERS AS THE CHURCH IS ABLE TO DO SO. 3. TO HELP THE MOST UNDERPRIVILEGED, DEPRIVED AND VULNERABLE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY, PROVIDING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS OF THEIR TRADITIONS AND BELIEFS, WHILST PROMOTING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 4. TO PROVIDE A SPACE WHERE GROUPS AND INDIVIDUALS CAN MEET, ACKNOWLEDGE EACH OTHER, LEARN TO LISTEN, AND SHARE EXPERIENCES. 5. PROMOTES THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH SOCIAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES AND BY PREACHING OF GOSPEL. 6. CAMPAIGNS AGAIN TRAFFIC AND CONSUMPTION OF DRUGS AND PREVENTION OF ALCOHOL AND DRUGS DEPENDENCY. 7. TO DO ANY AND ALL THINGS RELATED TO AND IN CONNECTION WITH THE CARRYING OUT OF THE OBJECT AND PURPOSE HEREIN ABOVE SET FORTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 BAILLIE STREET
ROCHDALE
OL16 1JG
- Phone:
- 07783667196
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window