DORSET YOUTH BOWLS ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offer coaching and competitive opportunities through an academy based structure of youth bowlers , under 18 years old , residing in Dorset, in the Sport of Flat Green Bowls . Indoors and Outdoors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 11 December 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Ives B.E.M | Chair | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Ann Champion | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Karen Leake | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/04/2021 | 02/04/2022 | 02/04/2023 | 02/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.04k | £5.49k | £3.03k | £4.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £367 | £3.48k | £1.37k | £1.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 April 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2022 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 19 NOV 2019 as amended on 27 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECT IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 WHO PARTICIPATE AT A BOWLING CLUB IN DORSET BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BOWLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
DORSET YOUTH BOWLS ACADEMY
DORCHESTER BOWLS CLUB
ARMADA WAY
DORCHESTER
DT1 2TN
- Phone:
- 01202056105
- Email:
- julesleake@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window