Financial history THE WILMSLOW TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 515148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £910 £1.53k £260 £304 £150
Total expenditure £1.83k £1.57k £1.60k £1.68k £1.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A