STANLEY BEAU FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stanley Beau Foundation supports children with life limiting illness and their families by providing holidays and short breaks in Devon as well as days out and small equipment grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 09 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma MURPHY | Chair | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Davis RN | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Brown | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katie Louise Cavanna | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | £19.70k | £18.18k | £18.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.62k | £9.43k | £19.67k | £20.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 0-19 WITH LIFE LIMITING OR LIFE-THREATENING MEDICAL CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES BY: A) PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS AND ACTIVITIES; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY; C) ANY OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 ALBERT TERRACE
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ12 2BE
- Phone:
- 07880331620
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window