Financial history THE WOLVERHAMPTON GRAND THEATRE (1982) LIMITED

Charity number: 515154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £8.88m £5.44m £2.31m £8.62m £10.04m
Total expenditure £8.62m £5.55m £2.47m £7.54m £9.15m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £454.60k £2.16m £592.70k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £46.97k £553.20k £2.18m £665.49k £77.53k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £185.02k
Income - Charitable activities £8.75m £4.84m £101.51k £7.92m £9.57m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £42.45k £47.30k £27.68k £30.71k £86.72k
Income - Other £40.59k £0 £0 £0 £117.04k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.62m £5.55m £2.47m £7.54m £9.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £87.81k