Trustees THE WOLVERHAMPTON GRAND THEATRE (1982) LIMITED

Charity number: 515154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Duncan Charles Allen Jones Chair 17 October 2023
None on record
Ben Bourton-Payne Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
Major Rana Trustee 03 January 2022
None on record
Samuel Hudman Trustee 22 July 2021
None on record
Nuala O'Kane Trustee 04 April 2017
None on record