MILL ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, WELLINGBOROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the Christian faith principles through regular Sunday services,bible study groups and Friday evening social gatherings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 19 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Duncan Eric Wright | Chair | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian John Parker | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Buba Mshelia | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Elizabeth Squires | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Agyemang | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arooj Cecil | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robinson | Trustee | 22 January 1978 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £66.29k | £77.26k | £114.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £59.08k | £66.41k | £78.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Mar 2020 as amended on 06 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill Road Baptist Church
Mill Road
WELLINGBOROUGH
Northamptonshire
NN8 1PF
- Phone:
- 01933276631
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window