LOWES BARN COMMUNITY PROJECT CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish a Community Centre for Durham City South West and neighbourhoods, based on the work of the Lowes Barn Community Project small charity constituted in 2017. There is a rapidly growing population here which lacks such a facility. The LBCP CIO will provide a community led programme of healthy recreation and well-being for all including community activities, exercise, music, arts & crafts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£644,447
Donations and legacies | £630.00k | |
Charitable activities | £11.45k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £21 | |
Other | £2.97k |
Total expenditure:
£19,035
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £19.04k | |
Other | £0 |
£21 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £572,607 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £19.04k | |
Retained for future use | £625.41k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £19.04k | |
Retained for future use | £625.43k |
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 02 November 2020: CIO registration
- Merryoaks Community Hall (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Alan Doig | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Clare Whelan | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Ann Walker | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Glen Eric Walker | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Ruerup | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM HAROLD GREEVES | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|||||
SUZANNE MCGOAY | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Anne Thompson | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Murray-Kemp | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £105.29k | £644.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £94.91k | £19.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £94.91k | £572.61k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £630.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £11.45k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £21 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £2.97k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £19.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £718.15k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £42.24k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £29.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF DURHAM CITY SOUTH WEST (INCLUDING NEVILLE'S CROSS, CROSSGATE MOOR, MERRYOAKS, SHERATON PARK, MOUNT OSWALD AND STONEBRIDGE) AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. 2) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Merryoaks Community Hall
Park House Road
DURHAM
DH1 3QF
- Phone:
- 07387174624
- Email:
- secretarylowesbarn@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window