WHYTELEAFE FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes, Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 February 2020: CIO registration
- 26 July 2022: Funds received from 234218 UNITED FREE CHURCH, WHYTELEAFE, SURREY (FUNDS HELD...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Geoffrey Cross | Chair | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beverly Kay Gallet | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Mary Webb | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Moratuwage Thisari Sugandani Tennakoon | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £310.10k | £202.58k | £62.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £226.57k | £39.59k | £41.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 November 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whyteleafe Free Church
157A Godstone Road
WHYTELEAFE
CR3 0EH
- Phone:
- 02086452387
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window