THE PERROTTS FOLLY COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 30 May 1984: Standard registration
- 29 September 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PERROTT'S FOLLY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2004 | 31/05/2005 | 31/05/2006 | 31/05/2007 | 31/05/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.24k | £55 | £58.19k | £3.28k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £532 | £623 | £58.57k | £155 | £171 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | 05 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2007 | 16 April 2008 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2006 | 29 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2006 | 28 March 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2005 | 08 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 MAY 1984
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE ACQUISITION PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BUILDING KNOWN AS PERROTTS FOLLY (THE FOLLY) AND ITS GROUNDS AS A BUILDING OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST AND MORE PARTICULARLY (A) ESTABLISHING A MUSEUM WITHIN THE FOLLY INSOFAR AS ANY PART OF THE FOLLY AND GROUNDS ARE NOT REQUIRED FOR THE SAID PURPOSE HEREINBEFORE DESCRIBED THEY SHALL BE USED TO PROVIDE FACILITIES WITHIN THE FOLLY AND ITS GROUNDS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS LIVING IN THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
EDGBASTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window