MASJID & IMAMBARGAH SHUHDAE KARBALA

Charity Number: 1187832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious services Educational services

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £38,844
Total expenditure: £40,832

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 February 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Yawar Ali Shah Chair 14 May 2025
None on record
Raja Amjad Nawaz Trustee 05 January 2024
None on record
HAMZA ALI SHAH Trustee 13 July 2023
UNITED RELIEF
Received: On time
Mohammad Ali Shah Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
SYED TANWEER HUSSAIN SHAH Trustee 26 May 2023
None on record
Syed Shah Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Syed Ali Haider Trustee 05 December 2022
None on record
SYED MUHAMMAD BAQIR NAQVI Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
SHAKIR SHAH Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
Syed Abrar Shah Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £172.89k £70.28k £46.91k £38.84k
Total expenditure £136.44k £36.57k £52.55k £40.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 July 2024 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 30 July 2024 91 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 June 2023 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 15 June 2023 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 11 May 2022 11 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
383 Barking Road
LONDON
E13 8AL
Phone:
07984434567