THE OWEN JENKINS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Owen Jenkins Trust focuses its donation activities, but not exclusively so, in supporting charities in the environmental, homeless and youth development sectors in Shropshire, the Marches and the West Midlands area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Powys
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Telford & Wrekin
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Wrexham
Governance
- 29 January 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN GRACE JENKINS | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard Jenkins | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
PREBENDARY RICHARD DAVID JENKINS | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Jenkins | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £596.29k | £34.51k | £292.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.63k | £12.75k | £12.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £574.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £22.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £960 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £9.98k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £3.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME HELD BY THE TRUST TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WHETHER CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATED) AT SUCH TIME, IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAURISTON
5 ASHTON ROAD
SHREWSBURY
- Phone:
- 07811131386
- Email:
- richardmjenkins456@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window