HELP FOR HOMELESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help for Homeless provides vital support to the homeless on the streets of towns or cities in the South West. With help from its network of volunteers help for HOMELESS goes onto the streets and distributes from a van essentials including; bedding, tents, clothing, sanitaryware and food.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 18 May 2020: CIO registration
- 17 April 2024: Funds received from 1091521 THE FIELDING CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Francis White | Chair | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bleaney | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alisdair Harris | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosanna Iona White | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.22k | £45.94k | £51.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.86k | £26.17k | £31.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE IN NEED IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WHO ARE STREET HOMELESS PEOPLE AND THOSE IN NEED WHO LIVE IN SHORT TERM/TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION SUCH AS HOSTELS, SHELTERS AND SUPPORTED HOUSING BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bush Farm
Babcary
SOMERTON
TA11 7DS
- Phone:
- 07850586019
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window