ST JOHN'S CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 515193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Church of England church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £30,552
Total expenditure: £25,843

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Lomas Trustee 25 January 2025
None on record
Glynn David Bevan Trustee 25 February 2022
None on record
Julie Ann Hughes Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Andrew Cox Trustee 11 December 2018
None on record
Glenn Hughes Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Keith James Lomas Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
MONICA LUCY COPE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.44k £12.51k £22.27k £27.51k £30.55k
Total expenditure £30.50k £37.09k £13.59k £26.17k £25.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £860 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 Bradley View
ASHBOURNE
Derbyshire
DE6 1RN
Phone:
01335342292
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available