CAMBRIDGE CENTRE FOR ANIMAL RIGHTS LAW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity are to advance education of the public in the subject of animal rights law, in particular but not exclusively by providing lectures, workshop, courses, conferences and other educational events in the subject of animal rights law; and by carrying out and promoting academic research in the subject of animal rights law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 July 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robert Wylie | Chair | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hugo Canwell | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.22k | £109.01k | £59.45k | £178.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.68k | £35.20k | £81.21k | £140.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTS 2.1 THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF ANIMAL RIGHTS LAW, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 2.1.1 PROVIDING LECTURES, WORKSHOP, COURSES, CONFERENCES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL EVENTS IN THE SUBJECT OF ANIMAL RIGHTS LAW; AND 2.1.2 CARRYING OUT AND PROMOTING ACADEMIC RESEARCH IN THE SUBJECT OF ANIMAL RIGHTS LAW AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scrutton Bland
Fitzroy House
Crown Street
IPSWICH
IP1 3LG
- Phone:
- 07951530153
- Email:
- info@animalrightslaw.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window